|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
21 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
4,072,066 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
3,370,163 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
28.74% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Messmer Daniel |
President & CEO |
2007-02-26 |
106,488 |
|
0 |
Meinert Deborah Jean |
Former VP/Secretary/CFO |
2015-01-02 |
82,369 |
|
0 |
Savitsky George |
Director |
2018-05-16 |
55,350 |
|
0 |
Fetherman David L. |
Chief Executive Officer, Director |
2020-04-24 |
113,584 |
|
0 |
Franklin Katherine F. |
|
2024-05-10 |
25,780 |
|
0 |
Williams A Graves Jr |
Director |
2003-12-01 |
54,157 |
2003-08-07 |
0 |
Frandsen Terry |
VP Finance - CFO |
2008-11-20 |
16,162 |
2003-09-04 |
0 |
Keller Robert J |
Former CEO, President, Directo |
2015-12-07 |
248,710 |
2007-08-10 |
0 |
Sincerbeaux Scott J |
Former CEO & President |
2021-03-04 |
26,890 |
2020-04-27 |
0 |
Wawrin Stephen |
|
2024-03-04 |
39,309 |
2016-02-27 |
0 |
Sehgal Anita |
|
2024-05-08 |
12,329 |
2022-05-10 |
0 |
Baalmann Richard Fenton Jr |
|
2024-05-10 |
110,394 |
2007-04-30 |
0 |
Blanc Yale |
Director |
2004-01-19 |
20,696 |
2004-01-19 |
4,000 |
White Richard |
Director |
2020-05-13 |
161,621 |
2020-05-13 |
4,360 |
Reed C W Bill |
Former President & CEO |
2006-04-20 |
799,380 |
2006-04-20 |
7,857 |
Glazer Walter P. Jr. |
|
2024-03-03 |
428,580 |
2024-03-03 |
8,500 |
Williams Keith P |
Retired Director |
2006-04-24 |
187,409 |
2006-04-24 |
11,487 |
Matthews Blaine E Jr |
Director |
2009-06-12 |
262,493 |
2009-06-12 |
89,000 |
Williams Edward E |
|
2024-05-10 |
153,302 |
2024-05-10 |
289,487 |
Griffin Patrick J |
|
2024-03-04 |
552,098 |
2024-03-04 |
1,328,736 |
Griffin Robert E |
|
2023-12-14 |
614,965 |
2023-12-14 |
1,626,736 |
|