|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
28 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
676,488 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
228,815 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
8.14% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Davis James A |
|
|
0 |
|
0 |
Johansen Roger A |
Officer |
2006-01-24 |
959 |
|
0 |
Bailey Kathie M |
SVP |
2013-05-23 |
0 |
|
0 |
Morris Richard R Jr |
Director |
2005-06-17 |
51,335 |
2003-07-25 |
0 |
Rasmusson Michael J |
Senior Vice President |
2006-08-30 |
0 |
2006-08-30 |
0 |
Hamre Clarence E |
Director |
2009-02-24 |
142,159 |
2003-09-19 |
0 |
Mason James Craig |
Director |
2009-11-20 |
20,287 |
2003-07-29 |
0 |
Robbel Ronald A |
Director |
2015-05-28 |
9,330 |
2006-10-24 |
0 |
Leodler Kathy D |
Director |
2017-06-22 |
205 |
2017-06-22 |
0 |
Suter Kelly |
Director |
2020-12-10 |
500 |
2020-12-10 |
0 |
Yerrington Daniel D |
Retired Director |
2020-12-24 |
107,893 |
2019-12-10 |
0 |
Smith David Alan |
Director |
2023-09-19 |
16,523 |
2003-09-02 |
0 |
Clinton Andrea M |
Director |
2024-07-26 |
7,565 |
2017-05-16 |
300 |
Parker Jon C |
Director |
2022-05-16 |
38,952 |
2010-09-14 |
1,000 |
Warren Harold L |
Director |
2007-10-23 |
4,535 |
2004-02-05 |
1,775 |
Debord Matthew J |
Chief Lending Officer/EVP |
2023-12-05 |
2,100 |
2023-12-05 |
2,069 |
Van Cise Todd |
Officer |
2021-01-01 |
1,000 |
2021-01-01 |
2,108 |
Stoney Michael John |
Director |
2023-09-26 |
7,850 |
2010-08-18 |
2,900 |
Antich Breanne D |
Chief Technology Officer/EVP |
2023-09-07 |
0 |
2023-09-07 |
4,174 |
Goldberg Larry David |
Director |
2021-03-12 |
7,375 |
2017-04-08 |
5,500 |
Drugge Robert A |
Director |
2023-11-09 |
32,600 |
2023-11-09 |
6,773 |
Foster Edward Colman |
EVP |
2023-11-07 |
5,005 |
2023-11-07 |
8,707 |
Basich Marci A |
Chief Financial Officer/EVP |
2023-08-11 |
0 |
2023-08-11 |
12,388 |
Fischer Jonathan Arthur |
EVP/COO |
2022-08-25 |
1,000 |
2022-08-25 |
13,029 |
Norawong John P |
Executive Vice President |
2008-10-01 |
1,800 |
2008-06-24 |
14,800 |
Brydon Dean J |
CEO, Director |
2023-11-16 |
30,074 |
2023-11-16 |
29,139 |
Backstrom Robert |
Director |
2004-03-04 |
30,668 |
2003-05-28 |
30,068 |
Sand Michael R |
CEO, Director |
2022-12-12 |
156,773 |
2022-11-04 |
94,085 |
|