|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
64 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
8,223,914 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
28,647 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
38.47% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Aksamit Dan David |
Sr VP-Chief Risk Officer |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2019-03-01 |
0 |
Appenzeller Melissa J. |
VP-Chief Actuary-EMCC |
2017-03-01 |
2,686 |
|
0 |
Asplund Ian Christopher |
Sr. VP-Chief Analytics Officer |
2019-09-01 |
0 |
|
0 |
Ball Margaret Ann |
Director |
2004-05-21 |
2,005 |
|
0 |
Bogart Jason R |
Senior Vice President |
2018-03-01 |
28,028 |
|
0 |
Booth Thomas W |
Director-EMCC-Parent Company |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2017-02-24 |
4,110 |
Briggs Blaine A |
Director Emeritus-EMCC-Parent |
2006-11-30 |
0 |
2006-11-13 |
1,562 |
Burgeson John C |
Dir,EMCC,Prnt Co,&Maj.Stkhldr |
2016-05-13 |
10,177 |
2005-05-05 |
0 |
Christie Peter S. |
Director |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2017-12-04 |
0 |
Crane Stephen A |
Director |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
|
0 |
Crew Daniel C |
Sr VP & Chief Underwriting Off |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2019-03-01 |
0 |
Davis Raymond W |
Sr.Vice President & Treasurer |
2010-10-01 |
15,509 |
2005-12-09 |
0 |
Employers Mutual Casualty Co |
Parent Co. & Majority Stkhldr |
2007-12-13 |
7,847,852 |
2003-06-27 |
0 |
Fisher David J |
Director |
2008-11-19 |
349 |
2008-11-19 |
2,265 |
Fletcher Jonathan R |
Director |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
|
0 |
Fredericks Bradley J |
Sr Vice President & CIO |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
|
0 |
Freese Vicki L |
Vice President |
2018-03-01 |
4,340 |
|
0 |
Gass Richard L |
Sr. Vice President-Retired |
2013-03-28 |
16,339 |
|
0 |
Griffin Gale L |
Director, EMCC Parent Co. |
2005-05-25 |
1,939 |
2014-03-10 |
4,933 |
Hallenbeck Ronnie D |
President, EMC Re,an affiliate |
2016-03-09 |
29,593 |
2003-07-07 |
0 |
Hamilton Lisa Lynn |
SVP-Chief Brand Off -Parent Co |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2019-02-28 |
0 |
Hamling Larry G |
Vice President-Parent Co |
2018-03-01 |
4,076 |
|
0 |
Hanson Rodney Dale |
Sr. Vice President |
2019-03-01 |
15,607 |
|
0 |
Hoffmann Richard W |
V.P., Gen. Counsel & Secretary |
2016-09-08 |
11,623 |
2016-09-08 |
5,572 |
Hovick Kevin J |
Exec. Vice President & COO |
2017-11-21 |
45,287 |
2005-01-31 |
0 |
Howe Robert Lee |
Director |
2018-02-13 |
25,381 |
2008-03-10 |
0 |
Jacobs Steven G |
Dir,EMCC,ParntCo&Maj.Stkhldr |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2014-03-12 |
0 |
Jean Ronald W |
Director, EMCC-Parent Company |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2006-03-08 |
0 |
Jean Scott Ronald |
Exec. Vice President |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
Johnson Kristi Kay |
Sr. Vice Pres - Parent Company |
2009-12-10 |
788 |
|
0 |
Kelley Bruce G |
President & CEO, Director |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
Kelley John H Dr |
Director, Parent co. |
2011-09-09 |
13,334 |
2003-09-22 |
0 |
Klemme Donald D |
Retired Sr.Vice Pres. & Sec. |
2008-03-06 |
5,538 |
2004-03-15 |
0 |
Koch Richard Jr |
Director, EMCC, Parent Company |
2007-02-28 |
0 |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
Larson Aaron Michael |
Sr.VP & S.A.D,EMCC,Parent Co. |
2016-11-03 |
2,357 |
|
0 |
Lehman Meyer T |
Chief Actuary |
2019-03-01 |
367 |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
Link Robert Lynn |
Sr. VP & Asst. Secretary |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
|
0 |
Lockhart John Thomas |
Director, EMCC, Parent Company |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2010-12-06 |
0 |
Lovell Michael Alan |
Executive Vice President |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
Mccullough Cheryl Lynn |
|
|
0 |
|
0 |
Michel Raymond A |
Director |
2008-07-30 |
6,450 |
2007-03-12 |
0 |
Murray Mary O |
Director, EMCC-Parent Company |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2010-03-12 |
0 |
Murray William A |
Director, EMCC-Parent Company |
2007-05-22 |
0 |
2015-06-23 |
8,103 |
Narigon David O |
Sr. Vice President |
2004-01-23 |
15,550 |
2004-01-23 |
0 |
Nigut Elizabeth A |
Senior Vice President |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2012-12-31 |
0 |
Paine Ronald Allan |
Senior Vice President |
2018-02-06 |
27,826 |
2018-02-06 |
572 |
Peck Steven C |
Sr.Vice President-Actuary |
2009-10-26 |
12,494 |
2005-01-27 |
0 |
Phillips Larry Wayne |
Sr. VP-Business Development |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
|
0 |
Prather Carla A |
Asst. VP and Controller |
2018-03-01 |
8,700 |
2005-06-02 |
0 |
Proctor David J W |
Director, EMCC-Parent Company |
2015-06-23 |
0 |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
Reese Mark E |
Senior Vice President & CFO |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2004-03-16 |
90 |
Schiek Fredrick A |
Director |
2007-02-28 |
16,991 |
2004-05-17 |
0 |
Schulz Richard Karl |
Senior Vice President |
2013-06-11 |
21,939 |
2009-07-28 |
0 |
Sederburg Kelvin Bryce |
Vice Pres. & Appointed Actuary |
2018-03-01 |
4,532 |
|
0 |
Simonetta Lisa Anne |
Senior Vice President |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
|
0 |
Singh Sanjeev K |
|
|
0 |
|
0 |
Stange Lisa A |
Vice Pres., Treasurer, & CIO |
2014-03-24 |
3,170 |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
Stockdale Joanne Lynn |
Director |
2006-08-21 |
1,049 |
2005-11-01 |
0 |
Strother Todd A |
Sr. VP, Gen Counsel & Sec |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2018-03-01 |
0 |
Tegeler Gretchen Hayne |
Director |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2008-03-10 |
0 |
Vanekeren Philip T |
Director,Emertius-parent co. |
2006-05-01 |
6,000 |
2006-05-01 |
1,440 |
Watts H Terrill Jr |
Director, EMCC, Parent Co. |
2010-12-15 |
3,747 |
2005-12-16 |
0 |
Ziegler David S |
Director, EMCC, Parent Co |
2019-09-19 |
0 |
2017-03-08 |
0 |
Zmolek Douglas J |
Retired Sr.Vice Pres.,Parent |
2005-12-01 |
12,291 |
2005-05-20 |
0 |
|