|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
20 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
974,372 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
139,715 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
19.76% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Powell James B |
Director |
2011-01-13 |
0 |
2011-01-13 |
30,413 |
Copland James R III |
Director |
2010-11-24 |
60,000 |
2010-11-24 |
39,910 |
Hornaday F D Iii |
Director |
2010-03-05 |
49,828 |
2010-03-05 |
6,282 |
Barbee Dexter R Sr |
Director |
2010-03-03 |
44,854 |
2005-07-28 |
0 |
Bobo H Thomas |
Director |
2009-11-02 |
33,633 |
2009-11-02 |
14,198 |
Crouch James B Jr |
Director |
2009-09-09 |
93,363 |
2009-09-09 |
18,520 |
Canaday Charles T |
President / CEO |
2009-02-17 |
37,369 |
2008-01-02 |
0 |
Holt John Anthony Sr |
Director |
2008-12-09 |
20,915 |
|
0 |
Smith James H Jr |
Director |
2008-12-01 |
32,032 |
2004-12-07 |
24,512 |
Waldrep George C Jr |
Director |
2008-11-26 |
2,900 |
|
0 |
Chandler Thomas E |
Director |
2008-11-24 |
98,546 |
2004-06-17 |
0 |
Ward Robert A |
Director |
2008-11-03 |
49,900 |
2008-11-03 |
5,880 |
Cary Randolph J Jr |
Former President/CEO |
2008-02-07 |
106,413 |
2005-11-01 |
0 |
Koury Teena M |
Director |
2008-01-08 |
40,359 |
2008-01-08 |
0 |
Love John H |
Director |
2008-01-07 |
28,143 |
2008-01-07 |
0 |
Roberts John K |
Director |
2008-01-02 |
68,851 |
2008-01-02 |
0 |
Patterson Robert Craig |
Chief Credit Officer |
2008-01-02 |
56,392 |
2008-01-02 |
0 |
Holt Ralph M Jr |
Retired Director |
2007-12-13 |
127,035 |
2006-07-12 |
0 |
Redcay Christopher B |
CFO |
2007-02-16 |
20,147 |
2007-02-05 |
0 |
Spencer David |
Former CFO |
2003-10-31 |
3,692 |
2003-08-15 |
0 |
|