|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
34 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
1,547,318 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
665,445 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
35.49% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Sullivan Matthew M |
Chief Accounting Officer |
2024-08-05 |
17,742 |
2022-02-07 |
0 |
Foster Dale Richard |
Chief Executive Officer |
2024-08-05 |
99,934 |
2018-05-07 |
0 |
Legrottaglie Vito |
Chief Information Officer |
2024-08-05 |
54,402 |
|
0 |
Popovich Timothy |
Chief Operating Officer |
2024-08-05 |
22,094 |
|
0 |
Bass Charles Edward |
Chief Marketing Officer |
2024-08-05 |
35,413 |
2018-05-07 |
0 |
Clark Andrew E |
Chief Financial Officer |
2024-08-05 |
31,360 |
2021-07-08 |
0 |
Mccarthy John R |
Director |
2024-06-18 |
18,527 |
2019-08-06 |
0 |
Scorziello Greg |
Director |
2024-06-18 |
7,541 |
2022-08-02 |
0 |
Geygan Jeffrey Richart Geygan |
Director |
2024-06-18 |
25,552 |
2024-06-18 |
143,488 |
Boren Kim |
Director |
2024-06-18 |
5,796 |
2023-08-18 |
0 |
Gold Gerri |
Director |
2024-06-18 |
9,522 |
2021-08-03 |
0 |
Bryant Andrew S |
Director |
2024-06-18 |
13,804 |
2019-08-06 |
0 |
Dibattiste Carol A |
Director |
2021-08-03 |
8,322 |
2020-08-07 |
0 |
Crane Ross |
Director |
2021-08-03 |
6,612 |
2020-08-07 |
0 |
Vesey Michael |
Vice President & CFO |
2021-05-05 |
44,701 |
2017-02-07 |
0 |
Kurty Diana |
Director |
2020-12-02 |
11,609 |
2016-06-01 |
0 |
Faith Michael |
Director |
2020-06-01 |
2,000 |
2011-04-05 |
2,000 |
Scull Kevin T |
Former VP & CAO |
2020-05-05 |
9,712 |
2006-08-15 |
0 |
Gilbertson Brian |
Former VP & GM Lifeboat Dist |
2019-08-05 |
9,877 |
|
0 |
Dewindt David Stephen |
President & CEO, Director |
2019-02-13 |
9,500 |
2014-08-05 |
0 |
Nynens Simon F |
Resigned CEO as of 5/11/18 |
2018-07-19 |
261,568 |
2003-11-07 |
0 |
Botti William Roger |
Executive VP |
2017-11-06 |
42,497 |
2014-10-21 |
0 |
Bevis Richard |
Vice President of Marketing |
2015-05-05 |
25,879 |
2007-11-19 |
0 |
Meyercord F Duffield |
Director |
2015-03-24 |
95,875 |
2005-04-14 |
0 |
Weingarten Allan D |
Director |
2015-02-13 |
30,560 |
2006-02-01 |
0 |
Giordano Shawn |
VP of Sales - TechXtend |
2014-08-06 |
3,549 |
2008-08-05 |
0 |
Jamieson Daniel T |
VP & GM of Lifeboat Dist. |
2014-08-05 |
28,827 |
2004-11-01 |
0 |
Boyer Mark Thomas |
Director, Director |
2014-08-05 |
139,732 |
2005-03-07 |
383,100 |
Morgens Edwin H |
Director, Director |
2014-02-28 |
115,956 |
2005-02-07 |
136,857 |
Flaherty Thomas Joseph |
CFO |
2014-02-12 |
24,286 |
2012-12-10 |
0 |
Willett William H |
Director |
2010-02-09 |
19,501 |
2004-11-10 |
0 |
Largiader Jeff |
VP Sales & Marketing |
2007-05-07 |
12,500 |
2003-08-26 |
0 |
Roi Partners L P |
10% Owner |
2005-03-03 |
302,568 |
2003-11-07 |
0 |
Sight James W |
Director |
2004-02-03 |
0 |
2003-09-08 |
0 |
|