|
|
|
|
|
My Recent Searches
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
AEP Industries Inc (AEPI) |
|
|
$0.00 0.00 (0.00%) as of 4:30 Fri 2/14
|
|
Download |
|
|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
35 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
1,831,331 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
4,061,354 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
32.7% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Barba J Brendan |
Chairman and CEO, Director, 10% Owner |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
Powers John J |
President and COO, Director |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
Guerrera Linda |
VP Finance & Controller |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
Cron Robert W |
EVP Sales and Marketing |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
Noll Lawrence R |
VP Tax & Administration |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
Bell Robert |
Director |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
Vegliante Paul |
EVP Operations |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
Khoshaba Daniel |
10% Owner |
2009-03-04 |
0 |
2016-12-27 |
624,008 |
Ksa Capital Management, Llc |
10% Owner |
2008-12-12 |
0 |
2015-12-03 |
824,658 |
Davis Richard Eugene |
Director |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2013-01-25 |
0 |
Feeney Paul M |
EVP, Finance & CFO, Director |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2012-12-18 |
0 |
Rafferty James B |
VP & Treasurer |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2012-10-03 |
0 |
Crown Cork & Seal Co Inc |
10% Owner |
2014-04-21 |
143,104 |
2012-03-16 |
0 |
Smithwood General Partner, Llc |
10% Owner |
2011-06-17 |
111,297 |
2010-01-15 |
671,900 |
Cron David |
EVP, Manufacturing |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2009-09-15 |
0 |
Ksa Capital Partners Lp |
10% Owner |
2009-02-09 |
0 |
2009-03-03 |
819,988 |
Loeb Daniel S |
10% Owner |
2007-01-03 |
0 |
2007-06-27 |
0 |
Third Point Offshore Fund, Ltd. |
10% Owner |
2007-02-23 |
786,200 |
2007-02-13 |
1,120,200 |
Stewart Lee C |
Director |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
2006-09-15 |
0 |
Radoff Bradley Louis |
See Remarks Below |
2006-08-11 |
174,268 |
2006-08-11 |
0 |
Avia Kenneth |
Director |
2013-04-12 |
783 |
2006-04-03 |
0 |
Gelbard Paul E |
Director |
2010-01-20 |
710 |
2006-03-20 |
0 |
Constantino Matthew |
Former Director (1) |
|
0 |
2005-02-09 |
150 |
Press Eric |
Former Director |
|
0 |
2005-02-04 |
150 |
Seminara Robert V |
Former Director |
|
0 |
2005-02-04 |
150 |
Zaken Jordan C |
Former Director |
|
0 |
2005-02-04 |
150 |
Clammer Adam |
Resigned as Director 8/12/04 |
2004-08-12 |
0 |
2004-08-12 |
0 |
Carroll Brian F |
Resigned as Director 8/12/04 |
2004-08-12 |
0 |
2004-08-12 |
0 |
Stoll William F Jr |
Director |
2003-07-18 |
0 |
2003-07-18 |
0 |
Reich Edgar |
EVP, International |
2006-08-30 |
0 |
2003-07-07 |
0 |
Kelley Kevin M |
Director |
2003-03-31 |
0 |
2003-03-31 |
0 |
Lallier Jean |
Formerly VP,Gen Counsel&Secret |
2003-02-05 |
1,172 |
2003-02-05 |
0 |
Brooks Jonathan |
10% Owner |
2011-03-14 |
613,797 |
|
0 |
Belsky Ira |
Director |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
|
0 |
Gallagher Frank P |
Director |
2017-01-20 |
0 |
|
0 |
|
|