|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
52 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
18,084,067 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
8,223,123 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
35.38% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Overbeek Brent |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2023-07-01 |
0 |
Mannis Avi |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2023-07-01 |
0 |
Rose Crystal |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2023-05-17 |
0 |
Akins Daniel W. |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2023-05-17 |
0 |
Vosburg Craig |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2022-07-06 |
0 |
Beck Wendy A. |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2022-07-06 |
0 |
Schneider Mark D. |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2022-02-08 |
0 |
Hrdlicka H Jayne |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2020-07-27 |
0 |
Mcnamara Michael Edward |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2020-07-27 |
0 |
Dhar Abhi |
Director |
2019-05-15 |
7,407 |
2017-09-14 |
0 |
Hershfield Lawrence |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2016-09-23 |
2,000 |
Guerrieri Joseph Jr |
Director |
2021-05-19 |
23,864 |
2016-05-18 |
0 |
Fry Earl E |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2016-05-18 |
0 |
Hirzel Zac |
Director |
2016-02-23 |
7,952 |
2016-02-23 |
0 |
Snook Jonathan D. |
|
2024-09-18 |
249,719 |
2016-02-03 |
0 |
Alter Aaron J |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2016-02-03 |
0 |
Kobayashi Bert T Jr |
Director |
2015-04-07 |
39,485 |
2015-04-07 |
36,469 |
Menke Sean E |
EVP and COO |
2015-02-03 |
51,734 |
2014-10-29 |
0 |
Jenson Randall |
Director |
2022-05-18 |
72,680 |
2013-05-22 |
988,567 |
Anderson-Lehman Ronald |
EVP and CAO |
2017-05-02 |
34,847 |
2013-02-07 |
0 |
Moriizumi Tomoyuki |
Director |
2016-05-17 |
21,343 |
2012-05-24 |
0 |
Zwern Richard N |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2012-05-24 |
0 |
Osborne David J. |
EVP, CIO |
2012-03-05 |
46,091 |
2012-03-05 |
0 |
Topping Scott E |
EVP, CFO and Treasurer |
2015-01-07 |
62,724 |
2011-10-31 |
0 |
Boyer Brian E. |
Director |
2014-03-17 |
17,539 |
2011-05-31 |
0 |
Nardello Charles R |
SVP-Operations |
2014-03-20 |
77,823 |
2011-02-07 |
0 |
Zia Hoyt |
Secretary |
2015-10-22 |
45,563 |
2011-02-07 |
0 |
Budge L Todd |
Director |
2012-05-29 |
33,469 |
2010-05-26 |
0 |
Poomaihealani Samson |
Director |
2015-10-27 |
22,921 |
2010-05-26 |
0 |
Rose Crystal K |
Director |
2022-05-18 |
44,935 |
2010-05-26 |
0 |
Swelbar William S |
Director |
2022-11-14 |
26,686 |
2010-05-26 |
0 |
Woerth Duane E. |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2010-05-26 |
0 |
Ingram Peter R |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
2009-02-20 |
0 |
Anderson Gregory |
Director |
2016-02-19 |
28,960 |
2008-09-30 |
0 |
Fargo Thomas B |
Director |
2008-08-11 |
0 |
2008-08-11 |
0 |
Schultze George J |
10% Owner |
2008-10-10 |
4,424,130 |
2008-08-08 |
0 |
Falvey Barbara |
SVP-Human Resources |
2018-01-30 |
71,936 |
2008-08-08 |
0 |
Kim Sean |
Director |
2009-09-10 |
0 |
2008-06-10 |
0 |
Taniguchi Glenn G |
SVP-Marketing and Sales |
2014-03-06 |
55,701 |
2008-05-06 |
0 |
Schultze Master Fund, Ltd. |
10% Owner |
2008-08-07 |
4,596,942 |
2008-04-10 |
0 |
Dunkerley Mark B |
President and CEO, Director |
2018-01-30 |
365,215 |
2007-11-09 |
0 |
Nicolai Eric |
Director |
2006-02-14 |
47 |
2007-05-01 |
680 |
Rc Aviation Management Llc |
10% Owner |
2008-05-07 |
2,321,725 |
2006-06-02 |
5,033,528 |
Smith Jeffrey A |
10% Owner |
|
0 |
2005-01-07 |
2,159,403 |
Adams John W |
Director |
2004-06-21 |
0 |
2004-06-21 |
0 |
Aip Llc |
10% Owner |
2005-01-07 |
2,159,403 |
2004-06-14 |
0 |
Morella Reno F |
RESIGNED AS DIRECTOR, Director |
2004-01-23 |
100 |
2004-01-23 |
2,476 |
Safady Edward Z |
Director |
2003-12-04 |
0 |
2003-12-04 |
0 |
Rc Aviation Llc |
10% Owner |
2006-06-02 |
3,066,827 |
|
0 |
Carty Donald J |
Director |
2021-12-16 |
17,701 |
|
0 |
Panagiotoulias Theodoros |
SVP - Global Sales & Alliances |
2023-04-06 |
88,598 |
|
0 |
Okinaka Shannon Lei |
|
2024-09-18 |
0 |
|
0 |
|