|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
75 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
5,384,640 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
5,859,017 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
6.84% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Markel Corp |
10% Owner |
2013-02-15 |
2,495,997 |
|
0 |
Clarke Michael W |
|
2021-01-06 |
418,349 |
2021-01-06 |
129,037 |
Caton Douglas E |
Director |
2006-01-03 |
280,582 |
2012-12-03 |
423,366 |
Asbury John C |
|
2024-03-15 |
228,699 |
2024-03-15 |
583 |
Murphy W Tayloe Jr |
|
2021-07-01 |
162,865 |
2021-07-01 |
2,772 |
Shephard Joel R |
|
2024-07-01 |
109,032 |
2024-07-01 |
135 |
Beale G William |
Director |
2018-09-20 |
100,462 |
2018-09-20 |
52,419 |
Whittaker Arthur D |
Director |
2009-12-01 |
93,551 |
2009-12-01 |
4,990 |
Hicks Ronald L |
Director |
2015-03-20 |
92,006 |
2015-03-20 |
2,350 |
Gorman Robert Michael |
|
2024-03-15 |
75,302 |
2024-03-15 |
2,210 |
Mahon Walton |
Director |
2004-12-21 |
73,489 |
2004-12-21 |
21,455 |
Tedesco Maria P |
|
2024-03-15 |
67,752 |
2024-03-15 |
275 |
Barham O R Jr |
Director |
2014-01-01 |
67,211 |
2014-01-01 |
0 |
Ukrop James E |
Director |
2013-02-22 |
64,373 |
2013-02-22 |
806,933 |
Ellett Frank Russell |
|
2024-07-01 |
57,676 |
2019-09-03 |
0 |
Wright William M |
Director |
2003-12-18 |
40,985 |
2003-12-18 |
0 |
Combs Glen C |
Director |
2019-03-01 |
38,131 |
2019-03-01 |
9,776 |
Morin R Hunter |
Director |
2014-01-01 |
37,448 |
2014-01-01 |
16,523 |
Baker Lee S |
Director |
2014-01-01 |
37,003 |
2014-01-01 |
0 |
Ring David V |
|
2024-03-15 |
35,551 |
2024-03-15 |
378 |
Peay A Anthony |
EVP |
2017-08-31 |
34,813 |
2017-08-31 |
14,335 |
Neal John C |
Executive Vice President |
2015-11-20 |
34,769 |
2015-02-26 |
10,621 |
Smoot Raymond D Jr |
Director |
2019-03-01 |
34,182 |
2014-01-01 |
0 |
Myers Alan W |
|
2022-01-03 |
33,418 |
2022-01-03 |
1,000 |
Agee Nancy H |
|
2024-07-01 |
32,369 |
2024-04-01 |
0 |
Brown M Dean |
|
2022-02-24 |
31,518 |
2022-02-24 |
661 |
Tillett Ronald L |
|
2024-01-02 |
31,432 |
2023-01-03 |
8,107 |
Moore Hullihen W |
Retired Director |
2013-07-25 |
30,721 |
2005-02-25 |
17,250 |
Parrish H Wayne |
Director |
2014-01-01 |
29,999 |
2014-01-01 |
0 |
Hoover Jan S |
|
2022-07-01 |
29,795 |
2014-01-01 |
0 |
Bilko David |
|
2022-02-24 |
29,330 |
2022-02-24 |
1,640 |
Mccann Patrick J |
|
2024-07-01 |
29,251 |
2024-07-01 |
201 |
Woolley Douglas F. Jr. |
|
2024-02-26 |
26,410 |
2024-02-26 |
6,672 |
Farrar Jeffrey W |
EVP |
2017-03-31 |
24,450 |
2017-03-31 |
1,687 |
Hallberg Christopher M |
Director |
2014-01-01 |
23,133 |
2014-01-01 |
604 |
Fisher Gregory L |
|
2022-04-01 |
22,200 |
2022-04-01 |
6,726 |
Dalton Beverley E |
|
2020-12-01 |
21,930 |
2014-01-01 |
0 |
Irvin Steven D |
Director |
2014-01-01 |
21,437 |
2014-01-01 |
405 |
Schreiner Linda V |
|
2024-07-01 |
19,980 |
|
0 |
Rohman Thomas P. |
|
2024-04-01 |
18,246 |
|
0 |
Obrien Shawn E. |
|
2024-02-26 |
18,070 |
2024-02-26 |
162 |
Corbin Patrick E. |
|
2023-01-03 |
17,752 |
2023-01-03 |
22,709 |
Steger Charles W |
Director |
2018-03-01 |
16,904 |
2014-01-01 |
0 |
Wampler Keith L |
|
2024-07-01 |
16,240 |
2023-01-03 |
12,058 |
Markel Steven A |
Director |
2012-12-03 |
16,040 |
|
0 |
Bentley Elizabeth M. |
EVP |
2017-12-31 |
15,629 |
2017-12-31 |
7,894 |
Lape Rachael R |
|
2024-02-26 |
15,507 |
2024-02-26 |
3,022 |
Stallings John G Jr. |
EVP |
2018-02-22 |
13,753 |
2017-11-01 |
0 |
Williams Sherry |
|
2024-02-23 |
11,608 |
2022-10-31 |
0 |
Snead Thomas G Jr |
|
2024-04-01 |
11,214 |
2024-04-01 |
37,322 |
Lagatta Loreen A. |
|
2021-03-05 |
10,919 |
2021-03-05 |
2,172 |
Hansen Daniel I |
|
2022-12-13 |
10,848 |
2022-12-13 |
127,243 |
Linderman Matthew L. |
|
2024-03-15 |
10,685 |
2023-02-23 |
0 |
Miller Clare |
|
2024-05-10 |
9,090 |
2022-06-23 |
0 |
Kimble Donald R |
|
2024-07-01 |
8,537 |
2024-01-02 |
0 |
Piland M Raymond III |
Director |
2003-12-18 |
8,465 |
2003-12-18 |
0 |
Wimbush Frederick Blair |
|
2023-01-03 |
5,476 |
2023-01-03 |
5,268 |
Fairchild David J. |
EVP |
2013-12-06 |
5,310 |
2013-06-04 |
1,350 |
Delorier Rilla S |
|
2024-07-01 |
4,460 |
2022-07-01 |
0 |
Orfe Janis |
EVP |
2011-02-01 |
3,387 |
2011-02-01 |
933 |
Hockemeyer Rex A |
EVP |
2015-04-30 |
2,707 |
2015-04-30 |
2,252 |
Armstrong L. Bradford |
|
2020-03-02 |
2,412 |
2020-03-02 |
22,490 |
Cox Heather |
|
2023-07-03 |
2,395 |
2022-09-08 |
0 |
Pfautz Susan E |
|
2022-02-24 |
2,132 |
2022-02-24 |
343 |
Slaughter Raymond L |
Director |
2018-03-01 |
2,057 |
2018-03-01 |
14,353 |
Bradley Frank B III |
Director |
2003-12-18 |
1,665 |
2003-12-18 |
0 |
Engola Paul |
|
2024-07-01 |
1,537 |
2024-01-02 |
0 |
Ohara Michelle A. |
|
2024-07-01 |
1,537 |
2024-01-02 |
0 |
Wilson David S |
Officer |
2007-06-28 |
1,062 |
2007-06-28 |
2,540 |
Newton N Byrd |
President & CEO Norhtern Neck |
2003-12-31 |
911 |
2003-12-31 |
0 |
Seitz Peter A |
Executive Vice President, Director |
2005-04-26 |
252 |
|
0 |
Sledd Robert C |
Director |
2003-12-18 |
232 |
2003-12-18 |
0 |
Roy Brian H |
Director |
2010-02-10 |
0 |
2010-02-10 |
451,561 |
Ukrops Services, L.c. |
10% Owner |
2010-07-23 |
0 |
2010-07-23 |
0 |
Ukrops Super Markets, Inc. |
10% Owner |
2010-07-23 |
0 |
2010-02-01 |
3,602,234 |
|