|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
35 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
8,379,184 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
3,771,877 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
58.23% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Malloy Patrick E |
Retired Chairman of the Board |
2015-05-29 |
5,325,982 |
2014-10-03 |
320,750 |
Lsp Investment Advisors, Llc |
10% Owner |
2018-03-29 |
1,838,510 |
2018-03-20 |
0 |
Ferchau Mark E |
Executive Vice President |
2019-12-16 |
187,306 |
2007-04-30 |
0 |
Callaghan John |
Director |
2008-05-22 |
179,594 |
|
0 |
Appel Sheldon |
Director |
2004-01-14 |
176,253 |
2004-02-25 |
132,208 |
Goodson Peter |
Director |
2015-05-29 |
87,369 |
2011-05-19 |
0 |
Schott Jan L |
SVP & Chief Financial Officer |
2014-12-16 |
83,195 |
2008-07-15 |
0 |
Webster Steven A |
Director |
2006-12-12 |
82,068 |
|
0 |
Washington Gene |
Director |
2015-12-16 |
75,511 |
2008-07-16 |
0 |
Barker Robert T |
SVP & CFO |
2020-12-14 |
73,122 |
|
0 |
Straty Stephen M. |
Director |
2015-05-29 |
66,667 |
2009-01-21 |
0 |
Davis James B |
SVP Engineering & Operations |
2007-09-12 |
48,990 |
2007-04-30 |
0 |
Ferraro Geraldin A |
Director |
2010-05-20 |
41,255 |
2010-05-20 |
5,310 |
Serota Jeffrey |
Director |
2021-12-23 |
26,433 |
2019-12-12 |
0 |
Looney David R |
EVP & CFO |
2010-02-12 |
20,532 |
2007-12-12 |
0 |
Goodrich Henry |
Director |
2013-12-13 |
20,495 |
2013-12-13 |
57,125 |
Pully Steven J |
Director |
2018-12-14 |
18,166 |
2017-12-08 |
0 |
Watler D Hughes |
CFO |
2006-03-29 |
15,668 |
2003-09-26 |
0 |
Smajstrla Dawn |
Vice President & Controller |
2013-12-24 |
10,890 |
2011-08-24 |
0 |
Seeligson Arthur A |
Director |
2016-05-18 |
855 |
2004-12-15 |
0 |
Austin Josiah T |
Director |
2016-09-22 |
323 |
2015-06-18 |
1,983,390 |
Perdue Michael J |
Director |
2016-08-12 |
0 |
2016-08-10 |
0 |
J.p. Morgan Securities Llc |
10% Owner |
2017-05-26 |
0 |
2017-06-20 |
609,041 |
Encap Partners Gp, Llc |
10% Owner |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
Goodrich Walter G |
Chairman and CEO, Director |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
2016-09-15 |
57,125 |
Leuliette Timothy D |
Director |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
2017-12-08 |
0 |
Coleman Ronald F |
Director |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
2017-07-07 |
0 |
Mcwatters Kristen |
Sr. Vice President, CFO & CAO |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
|
0 |
Souers Thomas M |
Director |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
2017-12-08 |
0 |
Kilelea Michael J |
EVP, Gen. Counsel, Corp. Secy |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
2009-03-02 |
0 |
Sondey Edward J. |
Director |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
2019-12-12 |
0 |
Turnham Robert C Jr |
President and COO, Director |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
2016-05-23 |
0 |
Leight Kenneth Adam |
Director |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
2017-12-08 |
0 |
Ulrich Kevin Michael |
|
|
0 |
2021-10-04 |
606,928 |
Franklin Resources Inc |
10% Owner |
|
0 |
2021-12-23 |
0 |
|