|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
49 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
3,265,782 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
10,357,501 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
13.15% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Tontine Capital Partners L P |
10% Owner |
2006-02-23 |
2,111,800 |
2010-10-04 |
3,019,651 |
Hale Charles M |
Director |
2007-08-31 |
244,407 |
2007-08-31 |
22,710 |
Hale Martin Demora |
Director |
2015-12-04 |
181,480 |
2015-12-04 |
24,000 |
Williams Patrick |
|
2024-02-29 |
167,216 |
2005-11-04 |
0 |
Kerrison Dennis Graham John |
Director |
2005-03-03 |
124,550 |
2004-05-03 |
0 |
Hale Martin M Jr |
Director |
2007-07-06 |
97,066 |
2007-07-06 |
12,000 |
Mcrobbie Ian Malcolm |
Senior VP R&T |
2023-02-27 |
36,679 |
2005-03-03 |
0 |
Watt Brian |
VP, Strat Plan & Regulatory |
2021-05-11 |
25,124 |
|
0 |
Revington Timothy Peter |
Market Manager - Octel Marine |
2003-12-11 |
22,645 |
2003-12-11 |
31,212 |
Aldous Hugh |
Director |
2019-12-06 |
20,157 |
2019-12-06 |
12,380 |
Boon Philip John |
|
2024-02-26 |
20,079 |
2003-12-03 |
0 |
Hanslip Hilary Alan |
VP - Human Resources |
2003-12-01 |
18,717 |
2004-03-19 |
18,717 |
Bew Robert Ernest |
ex Director |
2012-08-30 |
17,912 |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
Hessner Catherine |
Senior VP - Human Resources |
2021-05-11 |
15,194 |
2005-03-03 |
0 |
Hartley Andrew |
VP & General Counsel |
2012-02-29 |
14,856 |
2007-03-01 |
0 |
Williams David Earl |
GC & Chief Compliance Officer |
2018-05-24 |
14,516 |
|
0 |
Paller Robert I |
|
2024-02-26 |
14,343 |
2010-03-31 |
0 |
Cleminson Ian |
|
2024-08-26 |
12,996 |
2007-03-01 |
0 |
Shone Richard Tudor |
VP Safety, Health & Env. |
2008-05-16 |
12,386 |
2003-09-30 |
0 |
Puckridge James Martin Combe |
Director |
2009-07-06 |
10,269 |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
David Bentley Jones |
|
2024-03-01 |
9,664 |
|
0 |
Blackmore Milton C |
|
2024-02-26 |
9,028 |
2019-02-25 |
1,000 |
Barnes Corbin |
|
2024-05-14 |
8,051 |
2022-02-21 |
0 |
Padfield Larry |
|
2024-02-26 |
7,495 |
|
0 |
Dawson William Martin |
Exec VP Performance Chemicals |
2007-11-29 |
6,018 |
2005-11-18 |
0 |
Landless David |
|
2024-02-26 |
5,784 |
|
0 |
Roeser Joachim |
Director |
2017-11-29 |
5,260 |
2008-07-07 |
0 |
Haubold Samuel Allen |
Director |
2007-07-06 |
5,235 |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
Parrette Leslie J |
|
2024-08-13 |
4,734 |
2022-05-06 |
0 |
Griffin Hardy Louis Iii |
|
2024-05-20 |
4,523 |
2022-02-21 |
0 |
Poccia Claudia |
|
2024-02-26 |
3,879 |
2020-05-20 |
0 |
Arnold Elizabeth K |
|
2024-02-26 |
3,628 |
2022-02-21 |
0 |
Flore Benito |
Director |
2005-07-21 |
3,272 |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
Curran Philip |
Group Financial Controller |
2020-02-27 |
2,459 |
2010-11-19 |
0 |
Bracewell Mark |
Group Financial Controller |
2013-12-05 |
1,329 |
2007-08-13 |
0 |
Hignett Geoffrey John |
Snr VP Corporate Leadership |
2004-03-03 |
1,161 |
2004-03-01 |
0 |
Cartmell David |
Officer |
2005-05-02 |
858 |
|
0 |
Fearn Peter |
Director |
2008-07-07 |
531 |
2008-07-07 |
0 |
Todd Sharon Elizabeth |
Director of Corp. Development |
2005-03-03 |
481 |
2005-03-03 |
0 |
Jarvis Alan Geoffrey |
Retired Business Director |
2003-09-30 |
0 |
2003-09-16 |
30 |
Ashworth Heather Elizabeth |
Director Investor Relations |
2004-03-05 |
0 |
2004-03-04 |
0 |
Clark William Orr |
Operations & Supply Chain Dir. |
2004-05-17 |
0 |
2004-05-11 |
23,805 |
Lawson Duncan |
Group Financial Accountant |
2004-05-24 |
0 |
2004-05-12 |
0 |
Tayler John Philip |
Ex VP & General Counsel |
2004-05-25 |
0 |
2004-03-05 |
0 |
Gendell Jeffrey L Et Al |
10% Owner |
2006-05-04 |
0 |
2008-10-09 |
4,828,345 |
Nuttall Simon Kirkpatrick |
Head of Tax and Treasury |
2006-08-03 |
0 |
2006-08-03 |
0 |
Jennings Paul Willis |
Director |
2009-05-19 |
0 |
2005-03-03 |
0 |
Mcduff Patrick Joseph |
EVP & PRESIDENT FS AMERICAS |
2016-03-16 |
0 |
|
0 |
Tontine Asset Associates, L.l.c. |
10% Owner |
|
0 |
2011-06-28 |
2,363,651 |
|