|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
63 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
636,739 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
1,417,277 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
13.44% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Smith Catherine D |
10% Owner |
2003-10-23 |
13,008 |
2003-10-23 |
452,318 |
Dalrymple Elizabeth T |
Senior Vice President |
2008-05-06 |
2,990 |
2008-05-06 |
341,221 |
Dalrymple Robert H |
Director |
2024-01-17 |
2,833 |
2024-01-17 |
245,463 |
Falck Frederick Q |
Director |
2005-01-11 |
6,516 |
2005-01-11 |
126,342 |
Swan Richard W |
Director |
2021-01-19 |
36,949 |
2021-01-19 |
35,805 |
Wayne Michael J. |
Senior Vice President |
2012-12-19 |
1,066 |
2012-12-19 |
22,976 |
Dalrymple David J |
Director |
2024-01-17 |
23,416 |
2024-01-17 |
20,997 |
Wirth Thomas W |
Executive Vice President |
2024-08-06 |
3,926 |
2024-08-06 |
18,307 |
Difabio Louis C |
Executive Vice President |
2021-01-11 |
7,604 |
2021-01-11 |
16,212 |
Tomson Anders |
President & CEO, Director |
2024-01-18 |
39,791 |
2024-01-18 |
14,808 |
Sneeringer Eugene M. Jr |
Resigned as Director |
2017-01-11 |
54,989 |
2017-01-11 |
12,116 |
Forrestel Richard E Jr |
Director |
2024-01-17 |
13,995 |
2020-09-16 |
12,000 |
Denton Jerome F |
Executive Vice President |
2003-09-16 |
1,428 |
2003-09-16 |
10,885 |
Streeter Jeffrey B |
Director |
2024-01-17 |
13,484 |
2021-08-19 |
10,000 |
Potter John F |
Director |
2018-08-21 |
80,875 |
2018-08-21 |
9,650 |
Makowski Karen R |
Executive Vice President & CRO |
2020-01-02 |
5,357 |
2020-01-02 |
7,108 |
Krebs Karl Francis |
EVP, CFO & Treasurer |
2022-12-20 |
6,686 |
2022-12-20 |
5,899 |
Sartori Melinda A |
Executive Vice President |
2015-12-31 |
2,273 |
2015-12-31 |
5,575 |
Cole Loren D |
EVP & CIO |
2023-12-20 |
5,771 |
2023-12-20 |
5,513 |
Updegraff Jan P |
Director |
2014-10-09 |
1,606 |
2014-10-09 |
5,350 |
Eggers William D |
Retired Director |
2017-01-11 |
8,014 |
2017-01-11 |
4,647 |
Battersby John R Jr |
Officer |
2013-09-18 |
4,486 |
2011-12-21 |
4,341 |
Ward Norman R |
Senior VP & Auditor |
2011-04-20 |
300 |
2011-04-20 |
4,333 |
Whitaker Thomas J |
Senior Vice President |
2012-12-19 |
2,151 |
2012-12-19 |
3,677 |
Carr Richard G |
Executive Vice President |
2015-12-31 |
4,505 |
2015-12-31 |
3,677 |
Pichette Robert M |
Officer |
2012-04-18 |
161 |
2012-04-18 |
3,290 |
Corey James E Iii |
Executive Vice President |
2010-07-13 |
2,000 |
2010-07-13 |
3,067 |
Adamy Jane H |
Senior Vice President |
2011-12-21 |
875 |
2011-12-21 |
2,828 |
Kenefick Jeffrey P. |
Regional President |
2023-12-21 |
7,556 |
2023-12-21 |
1,937 |
Fariello Daniel D |
President, Capital Bank Div. |
2024-06-04 |
7,569 |
2024-06-04 |
1,705 |
Crimmins Michael J |
Senior Vice President |
2012-12-19 |
2,151 |
2012-12-19 |
1,500 |
Mckillip Kathleen S |
Officer |
|
0 |
2012-05-24 |
1,417 |
Struble Linda M |
Senior Vice President |
2011-12-21 |
671 |
2011-12-21 |
1,287 |
Crandall Catherine B. |
Officer |
|
0 |
2012-04-04 |
762 |
Mccormick Brendan P. |
Vice President & Auditor |
2012-12-19 |
612 |
2012-12-19 |
258 |
Sherwin Richard P. |
Officer |
|
0 |
2012-04-04 |
6 |
Blink Van Den Nelson |
Director |
2006-01-20 |
4,967 |
2006-01-20 |
0 |
Streeter Charles M Jr |
Director |
2011-01-19 |
15,678 |
2006-01-20 |
0 |
Agan Robert E |
Director |
2011-01-19 |
33,878 |
2006-01-20 |
0 |
Vita Charles J |
EVP, Chief Admin, Risk Ofcr. |
2011-10-25 |
0 |
2011-06-22 |
0 |
Meyer Ralph H |
Director |
2012-01-09 |
3,204 |
2004-12-23 |
0 |
Meier Thomas K |
Director |
2012-01-09 |
14,246 |
2004-07-29 |
0 |
Severson Mark A |
EVP, CFO & Treasurer |
2013-09-13 |
203 |
2012-12-19 |
0 |
Storch Robert L |
Director |
2016-01-08 |
3,630 |
2010-01-15 |
0 |
Tully Kevin B |
Director |
2020-01-15 |
2,623 |
2016-10-26 |
0 |
Drinkwater Clover M |
Director |
2020-01-15 |
12,841 |
2005-02-03 |
0 |
Becker Larry H. |
Director |
2022-01-26 |
38,495 |
2020-01-06 |
0 |
Vassallo Frank D |
Vice President & Controller |
2022-06-29 |
43 |
2019-12-18 |
0 |
Hazelton Kimberly A |
Executive Vice President |
2023-12-20 |
6,746 |
2021-05-14 |
0 |
Cosgrove Peter K |
Executive Vice President & CCO |
2023-12-20 |
5,454 |
2019-12-18 |
0 |
Stempin John J |
Controller |
2023-12-20 |
254 |
2022-12-20 |
0 |
Bentley Ronald M |
Director |
2024-01-17 |
45,988 |
2017-05-02 |
0 |
Gonick Denise V |
Director |
2024-01-17 |
5,468 |
2019-01-09 |
0 |
Lounsberry Stephen M III |
Director |
2024-01-17 |
21,275 |
2006-01-20 |
0 |
Buicko David M |
Director |
2024-01-17 |
7,429 |
2018-05-07 |
0 |
Tyrrell Thomas R. |
Director |
2024-01-17 |
7,749 |
2014-08-21 |
0 |
Meade Joseph F Iv |
Director |
2024-02-20 |
3,087 |
2022-11-02 |
0 |
Archibold Raimundo C. Jr |
Director |
2024-03-01 |
1,383 |
2022-01-26 |
0 |
Mckim Dale M. Iii |
EVP, CFO & Treasurer |
2024-07-03 |
3,746 |
2023-07-03 |
0 |
Funk Thomas E |
Controller |
2016-05-24 |
0 |
|
0 |
Boyea Bruce Walter |
Director |
2020-01-16 |
5,490 |
|
0 |
Long Koen G. |
Officer |
2022-07-26 |
174 |
|
0 |
Tranter G. Thomas Jr. |
Director |
2024-08-06 |
27,074 |
|
0 |
|