|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
16 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
2,346,659 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
4,241,512 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
4190.46% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Reynolds Marshall T |
Chairman/Chief Exec. Officer, Director, 10% Owner |
2011-07-18 |
1,826,615 |
2011-07-18 |
4,241,127 |
Mcelwain R Douglas |
Senior Vice President |
2010-06-29 |
32,534 |
2010-06-29 |
385 |
Nowlen Theodore J |
Vice President |
2004-02-18 |
800 |
2004-01-13 |
0 |
Parchman Todd L |
Resigned February 2, 2004 |
2004-04-13 |
1,200 |
2004-04-13 |
0 |
Wilcox Glenn W Sr |
Director |
2005-07-22 |
117,500 |
2005-07-22 |
0 |
Scaggs Neal |
Director |
2005-09-12 |
62,300 |
2005-09-12 |
0 |
Sansom Walter R |
Secretary |
2006-06-02 |
14,311 |
2006-06-02 |
0 |
Akers Louis J |
Director |
2008-07-09 |
14,000 |
2007-06-29 |
0 |
Mooney Harley F Jr |
Director |
2008-07-22 |
33,190 |
2006-03-01 |
0 |
Adkins Toney K |
President and COO |
2010-06-29 |
23,601 |
2006-05-10 |
0 |
Rhodes James A |
Senior Vice President |
2010-06-29 |
13,000 |
2006-05-31 |
0 |
Fry Todd R |
Sen.Vice Pres./Chief Fin. Off. |
2010-06-29 |
12,500 |
2006-05-24 |
0 |
Aldridge J Mac |
Senior Vice President |
2010-06-29 |
41,296 |
2006-05-16 |
0 |
Cline Philip E |
Director |
2013-12-30 |
52,419 |
2004-03-17 |
0 |
Hooten Charles R Jr |
Director |
2004-03-15 |
89,150 |
|
0 |
Williams William G Jr |
Senior Vice President |
2006-06-05 |
12,243 |
|
0 |
|