|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
62 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
1,051,760 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
365,452 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
7.04% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Spain Jr William D |
Director |
2010-11-15 |
45,186 |
2010-11-15 |
86,405 |
Achzet Russell K |
Director |
2006-01-24 |
31,726 |
2009-08-19 |
62,795 |
Spain Michael H |
Director |
2024-01-30 |
136,344 |
2024-01-30 |
42,050 |
Fulmer James W |
Director |
2023-07-31 |
39,393 |
2023-07-31 |
36,156 |
Romaine Stephen S |
President & CEO, Director |
2024-05-21 |
65,062 |
2024-05-21 |
16,066 |
Stewart Donald S |
EVP, Senior Trust Officer |
2007-03-01 |
27,165 |
2007-03-01 |
13,996 |
Fetsko Francis M |
EVP, COO, CFO & Treasurer |
2023-02-06 |
27,884 |
2023-02-06 |
10,288 |
Updike Lawrence A |
EVP, Retired 12/31/07 |
2008-02-06 |
42,965 |
2008-02-06 |
9,004 |
Hartz Gregory J |
EVP, Pres.&CEO Tompkins Trust |
2022-12-01 |
23,555 |
2022-12-01 |
8,921 |
Klein Gerald J Jr |
EVP Pres&CEO Mahopac Bank |
2021-11-04 |
25,296 |
2021-03-09 |
5,739 |
Bantle Robert B |
Exec. Vice President |
2012-11-07 |
5,935 |
2012-11-07 |
5,283 |
Gruber Scott L |
EVP, Pres. & CEO, VIST Bank |
2021-11-12 |
14,678 |
2021-03-12 |
5,254 |
Battaglia Paul J. |
Director |
2024-01-30 |
7,308 |
2024-01-30 |
5,131 |
Rawlings Hunter R Iii |
Director |
2009-12-31 |
1,015 |
2009-12-31 |
4,551 |
Boyce David S |
EVP, Pres. & CEO Tompkins Ins. |
2024-08-02 |
24,270 |
2024-08-02 |
4,425 |
Yunker Craig |
Director |
2022-03-01 |
30,875 |
2010-11-15 |
4,197 |
Haynes Carl E |
Director |
2012-10-12 |
4,701 |
2010-11-15 |
3,863 |
Kershaw David |
SVP, PAO |
2023-11-12 |
3,660 |
2023-11-12 |
3,638 |
Howard Brian A |
EVP, Pres. Tompkins Fin. Adv. |
2023-11-13 |
4,440 |
2023-11-13 |
3,474 |
Gates Reeder D |
Director |
2011-12-31 |
122,413 |
2011-12-31 |
3,201 |
Valenti Susan M. |
EVP, Corporate Marketing |
2024-08-02 |
16,038 |
2024-08-02 |
2,877 |
Shay Michael D |
Director |
2008-11-14 |
8,762 |
2008-11-14 |
2,635 |
Johnson Patricia A |
Director |
2024-07-05 |
3,885 |
2010-11-15 |
2,284 |
Griswold William W |
Director |
2006-10-31 |
0 |
2005-02-22 |
2,240 |
Mckenna John M |
EVP, Pres. Tompkins Comm. Bank |
2024-08-12 |
14,255 |
2024-08-12 |
2,191 |
Demilia David M |
EVP, Pres of TCB Hudson Valley |
2023-11-12 |
5,116 |
2023-11-12 |
1,981 |
Harrison Elizabeth W |
Director |
2010-08-31 |
271 |
2010-08-16 |
1,818 |
Torcello Diane D |
EVP & President, Tompkins WNY |
2023-11-12 |
5,233 |
2023-11-12 |
1,615 |
Hooks Edward C |
Former Director |
2003-11-14 |
4,081 |
2003-11-14 |
1,507 |
Hyland Rosemary G. |
EVP, Human Resources |
2016-01-29 |
4,313 |
2016-01-29 |
1,454 |
Page Richard W. |
Resigned 8/17/2012 |
2012-08-31 |
1,763 |
2012-08-31 |
1,353 |
Salm Thomas R |
Director |
2011-12-31 |
3,836 |
2011-12-31 |
1,268 |
Howell Bonnie H |
Director |
2004-12-31 |
3,916 |
2004-12-31 |
1,006 |
Guarino Charles J |
SVP Chief Bank Operations Off. |
2023-11-12 |
2,704 |
2023-11-12 |
975 |
Mastin Stacie M |
SVP, Director of HR |
2024-07-11 |
1,041 |
2024-07-11 |
897 |
Hardie James R |
Director |
2015-05-07 |
59,000 |
2015-05-07 |
780 |
Fontaine Alyssa H |
EVP, General Counsel & CRO |
2023-11-12 |
8,340 |
2023-11-12 |
772 |
Tomazin Matthew D |
EVP, CFO & Treasurer |
2023-11-12 |
1,186 |
2023-11-12 |
723 |
Fessenden Daniel J. |
Director |
2013-05-17 |
1,166 |
2010-11-15 |
673 |
Alexander John E |
Director |
2023-05-17 |
53,202 |
2023-05-17 |
655 |
Lindberg Bonita N |
SVP, Human Resource Director |
2024-05-03 |
4,805 |
2024-05-03 |
650 |
Mcclurg John D |
Director |
2024-08-29 |
12,834 |
2024-08-29 |
357 |
Angelis Stephen M |
Pres. Tomp. Finan. Advisors |
2015-11-10 |
1,500 |
2014-11-21 |
151 |
Cribbs Steven W |
SVP & Chief Risk Officer |
2022-02-07 |
382 |
2022-02-07 |
130 |
Rochon Thomas R. |
Director |
2024-07-05 |
9,924 |
2024-07-05 |
15 |
Perry Joseph H |
Former SVP (resigned 6/11/04) |
2004-12-31 |
15,922 |
2004-12-31 |
8 |
Maglione Joyce P |
SVP, Personnel |
2005-07-29 |
3,049 |
2003-10-28 |
0 |
Dolge Richard M |
SVPMarketing Tompkins Trust Co |
2006-01-31 |
0 |
2003-10-27 |
0 |
Garner Stephen E |
Pres & CEO Tompkins Trust Co |
2006-02-27 |
9,500 |
2004-05-11 |
0 |
Byrnes James J |
Director |
2014-05-07 |
45,236 |
2003-08-20 |
0 |
Henry Susan A |
Director |
2019-01-11 |
3,133 |
2011-11-09 |
0 |
Coletti Janet M. |
Director |
2024-05-16 |
2,000 |
2024-05-16 |
0 |
Taylor Eric W |
EVP, President TFA |
2024-08-01 |
495 |
2024-08-01 |
0 |
Rogers Thomas J |
EVP, Pres.&CEO AM&M Financial |
2011-02-07 |
0 |
|
0 |
Rooney Kathleen M |
EVP, Retired 3/31/2012 |
2012-06-22 |
2,444 |
|
0 |
Davis Robert D |
Officer |
2012-08-01 |
9,061 |
|
0 |
Parker Sandra A. |
Director |
2013-11-15 |
2,598 |
|
0 |
Milewski Frank C |
Director |
2021-08-16 |
19,041 |
|
0 |
Kunkel Ginger G |
President TCB Pennsylvania |
2023-11-09 |
3,757 |
|
0 |
Anderson Johanna B |
Officer: EVP, Pres., TCB CNY |
2023-11-09 |
1,271 |
|
0 |
Rahily Ita M |
Director |
2024-02-20 |
8,454 |
|
0 |
Weber Alfred J |
Director |
2024-07-05 |
14,375 |
|
0 |
|