|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
33 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
6,492,979 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
19,195,239 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
3.31% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Fir Tree Inc |
10% Owner |
2017-08-21 |
0 |
2020-08-14 |
15,896,252 |
Watford Michael D |
Chairman, President and CEO, Director |
2017-05-08 |
2,385,797 |
2010-12-29 |
3,298,987 |
Benton F Fox |
Chief Financial Officer |
2005-02-18 |
0 |
2003-12-08 |
0 |
Kauffman Charlotte Harrell |
Corporate Secretary |
2005-05-25 |
0 |
2003-12-08 |
0 |
Ault Brian |
Vice President Operations |
2005-07-13 |
0 |
2004-08-02 |
0 |
Nielson James E |
Director |
2006-04-20 |
342,607 |
2004-05-03 |
0 |
Patterson George Michael |
Vice President International |
2006-12-28 |
316,000 |
2003-10-10 |
0 |
Roe James Clay |
Director |
2007-05-30 |
400,876 |
2003-10-10 |
0 |
Kneller Stephen Richard |
Retired |
2008-06-23 |
68,545 |
2003-10-10 |
0 |
Nance Stuart Evan |
VP, Marketing |
2011-05-13 |
18,159 |
2007-11-05 |
0 |
Rigney Robert Emory |
Director |
2011-05-25 |
1,135,828 |
2004-05-03 |
0 |
Smith Marshall D |
CFO |
2014-02-17 |
32,618 |
2006-04-07 |
0 |
Helton Dr William Charles |
Director |
2017-05-08 |
448,351 |
2003-12-19 |
0 |
Smith Garrett B |
V.P., Gen Counsel & Corp. Sec. |
2017-05-08 |
49,444 |
2016-02-15 |
0 |
Mcdaniel Stephen James |
Director |
2020-03-01 |
236,620 |
2006-10-27 |
0 |
Whyte James N |
Sr VP, Chief HR Officer |
2020-04-22 |
5,224 |
2020-04-22 |
0 |
Keeffe Michael J |
Director |
2020-05-25 |
296,976 |
2012-09-04 |
0 |
Honeyfield David |
Sr VP, Chief Financial Officer |
2020-08-31 |
0 |
2019-03-29 |
0 |
Johnson C Bradley |
President and CEO, Director |
2020-08-31 |
0 |
2011-05-13 |
0 |
Stratton J. Jay Jr. |
Sr VP, Chief Operating Officer |
2020-08-31 |
0 |
2018-12-26 |
0 |
Goldman Neal P |
Director |
2020-09-08 |
0 |
2017-05-08 |
0 |
Barnes Sylvia K. |
Director |
2020-09-08 |
0 |
2020-03-01 |
0 |
Solomon Mark T |
VP, Chf Acctg Ofr, Controller |
2020-09-08 |
0 |
2020-06-17 |
0 |
Kerr Kason |
VP, Gen Counsel, Corp Secy |
2020-09-11 |
20,334 |
2019-08-20 |
0 |
Picquet William R |
Vice President Operations |
2014-02-17 |
105,465 |
|
0 |
Selvius Douglas B |
VP, Exploration & Land |
2016-02-15 |
30,735 |
|
0 |
Brown Roger A |
Director |
2017-05-08 |
50,632 |
|
0 |
Shaw Garland R |
Sr. V.P. & CFO |
2017-05-08 |
129,188 |
|
0 |
Ash W Patrick |
V.P., Development |
2017-05-08 |
47,393 |
|
0 |
Delgado Maree K. |
See Remarks |
2019-05-25 |
17,071 |
|
0 |
Rogers A Kent |
V.P., Drilling & Completions |
2019-06-28 |
103,097 |
|
0 |
Mintz Alan J. |
Director |
2020-03-01 |
252,019 |
|
0 |
Scoggins Edward Andrew Jr. |
Director |
2020-09-11 |
0 |
|
0 |
|