|
|
|
|
|
My Recent Searches
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Allegheny Energy Inc (AYE) |
|
|
$0.00 0.00 (0.00%) as of 4:30 Fri 2/14
|
|
Download |
|
|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
31 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
738,045 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
12,674 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
0.44% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Feinberg David Matthew |
VP, Gen. Counsel & Secretary |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
Wahl William F |
VP, Controller & CAO |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
Hertzog David B |
VP and General Counsel |
2004-03-18 |
2,000 |
2004-03-18 |
0 |
Campbell John P |
Vice President |
2005-09-15 |
3,470 |
2005-09-15 |
0 |
Flitman David E |
Vice President |
2007-12-20 |
3,958 |
2007-12-20 |
382 |
Dickens Rodney L |
Vice President |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2010-09-28 |
0 |
Dudzinski Edward |
Vice President |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
Gleason Eric S. |
Vice President |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2010-09-28 |
0 |
Park Hyun |
Vice Pres. & General Counsel |
2006-04-05 |
6,611 |
2006-04-05 |
0 |
Walenczyk Bruce E |
Sr.VP & CFO (retired 06/01/03) |
2003-07-18 |
0 |
2003-06-24 |
0 |
Serkes Jeffrey D |
Sr. VP & Chief Fin. Officer |
2006-07-03 |
396,745 |
2006-07-03 |
682 |
Goulding Philip L |
Senior VP and CFO |
2008-10-13 |
236,006 |
2008-10-13 |
3,088 |
Oliver Kirk R |
Senior Vice President & CFO |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2009-11-20 |
0 |
Vogler Robert T |
Officer |
2003-09-04 |
1,079 |
|
0 |
Benson David C |
Former Officer |
2004-11-10 |
1,951 |
2004-11-10 |
8,003 |
Metz Frank A Jr |
Director |
2003-08-01 |
7,779 |
2003-08-01 |
0 |
Campbell Lewis B |
Director |
2003-08-01 |
4,213 |
2003-08-01 |
0 |
Hoecker James J |
Director |
2003-08-01 |
2,173 |
2003-08-01 |
0 |
Holland Wendell F |
Director |
2003-08-01 |
4,937 |
2003-08-01 |
0 |
Kleisner Ted |
Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2003-08-01 |
0 |
Baum Eleanor |
Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2003-08-01 |
0 |
Johnson Julia L |
Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2004-03-25 |
0 |
Sarsten Gunnar A |
Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2003-08-01 |
0 |
Baldwin H Furlong |
Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2004-03-19 |
0 |
Pappas Christopher D |
Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
|
0 |
Rice Steven H |
Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2003-08-01 |
0 |
Freidheim Cyrus F Jr |
Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2004-03-23 |
0 |
Sutton Michael H |
Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2004-06-01 |
0 |
Richardson Joseph H |
COO-Generation |
2007-08-25 |
67,123 |
2007-08-25 |
519 |
Davis Curtis H |
COO, Generation |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2010-09-28 |
0 |
Evanson Paul J |
Chairman, President & CEO, Director |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
2011-02-25 |
0 |
|
|