|
|
|
|
|
My Recent Searches
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
$1.25 0.00 (0.00%) as of 4:30 Wed 8/31
|
|
Download |
|
|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
26 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
5,052,923 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
16,000 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
53.18% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Deford Drexel Gravid Jr |
resigned as director 8/1/2019 |
2019-10-08 |
20,000 |
2019-02-25 |
0 |
Weidemann Etienne Louis |
President/CEO, Director |
2008-12-11 |
57,500 |
2005-12-08 |
0 |
Barlow William Caleb |
President & CEO, Director |
2021-01-26 |
160,000 |
2019-09-11 |
0 |
Mcmillan Michael Henry |
President & CEO, Director |
2022-09-01 |
0 |
|
0 |
Miller Robert L |
Director |
2004-06-30 |
5,000 |
2004-06-30 |
0 |
Gerrity Raymond Edward |
Director |
2004-09-14 |
0 |
2004-09-14 |
0 |
St Clare Mark |
Director |
2007-06-13 |
10,000 |
2007-06-13 |
0 |
Poll Max |
Director |
2008-12-31 |
25,000 |
2006-08-25 |
0 |
Case Edward Brennan |
Director |
2014-08-15 |
48,000 |
2006-09-11 |
0 |
Joyce Michael J |
Director |
2014-09-05 |
155,000 |
2008-11-17 |
0 |
Vanderhoof Michael D |
Director |
2014-12-16 |
1,427,580 |
2009-05-08 |
0 |
Pace John D |
Director |
2014-12-19 |
155,513 |
2004-12-16 |
16,000 |
Leonard William |
Director |
2015-03-10 |
1,738,346 |
|
0 |
Mathews Michael G. Jr. |
Director |
2017-01-13 |
583,333 |
|
0 |
Abouchar John D |
Director |
2019-08-16 |
91,001 |
|
0 |
Krandel Judith Finger |
Director |
2020-04-09 |
40,000 |
2019-02-25 |
0 |
Roberson Mark Daniel |
Director |
2022-09-01 |
0 |
2019-02-25 |
0 |
Mccashin Robert |
Director |
2022-09-01 |
0 |
2020-03-05 |
0 |
Meadows Theresa Zak |
Director |
2022-09-01 |
0 |
2019-02-25 |
0 |
Sellers Dana Davis |
Director |
2022-09-01 |
0 |
2020-03-05 |
0 |
Loria Michael Ross |
Director |
2022-09-01 |
0 |
2020-03-05 |
0 |
Flood John Lawrence Sr |
Director |
2022-09-01 |
0 |
2021-08-24 |
0 |
Terblanche Jacques |
COO |
2008-12-11 |
37,500 |
|
0 |
Anthony Paul Thomas |
CFO, Secretary |
2022-09-01 |
0 |
2006-08-29 |
0 |
Flynn Joseph J |
CEO, Director |
2017-07-01 |
53,136 |
2005-12-08 |
0 |
Nickell Charles Glenn |
|
2004-04-01 |
446,014 |
|
0 |
|
|