|
|
|
|
|
My Recent Searches
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
$0.00 0.00 (0.00%) as of 4:30 Fri 2/14
|
|
Download |
|
|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
22 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
362,885 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
57,120 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
2.48% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Morgan Gary J |
VP Finance, Secretary, Treasur, Director |
2011-03-28 |
36,618 |
2011-03-28 |
29,524 |
Murphy Neal E |
VP - Finance and CFO |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
Osterhoudt Lewis E |
VP & General Manager / Retired |
2013-01-30 |
1,991 |
2013-01-30 |
3,082 |
Edwards Thomas V |
VP & General Manager |
2006-03-16 |
378 |
2006-03-16 |
3,877 |
Verdone Vincent J |
VP & General Manager |
2007-01-31 |
0 |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
Kimmer Gregory C |
VP & General Manager |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
Tetley Paul A |
VP & General Manager |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
Replogle Robert P |
VP & Asst to President |
2008-04-10 |
82,727 |
2008-04-10 |
4,231 |
Haggert Sonja M |
Vice President |
2004-03-05 |
4,160 |
2004-03-05 |
11,883 |
Mersch William F |
Vice President |
2004-03-05 |
0 |
2004-03-05 |
4,395 |
Dalterio Gennaro A. |
Vice President |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
Lawley Alan |
Retired Director |
2009-08-18 |
53,862 |
2003-12-03 |
0 |
Dehont Raymond J |
President & CEO, Director |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
Board James G |
Executive Vice President |
2007-01-31 |
0 |
2007-01-31 |
128 |
Kacin William L |
Director |
2006-04-07 |
103,225 |
2005-01-31 |
0 |
Debenedictis Nicholas |
Director |
2009-03-02 |
79,924 |
2004-03-31 |
0 |
Morris Michael J |
Director |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2003-12-03 |
0 |
Glatfelter George H Ii |
Director |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2004-06-04 |
0 |
Wiessmann Robin L |
Director |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2011-12-19 |
0 |
Silverman Stanley W |
Director |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2011-12-19 |
0 |
Spires Judith A |
Director |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2011-12-19 |
0 |
Prajzner Edward J |
Corporate Controller & CAO |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
2013-08-27 |
0 |
|
|