|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
44 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
2,956,603 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
1,049,518 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
1.9% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Yoho Frank H |
Director |
2021-02-04 |
3,000 |
2020-05-15 |
0 |
Woodward J D |
Sr VP, Non-Utility Operations |
2006-04-01 |
728,364 |
2006-04-01 |
73,408 |
Ware Richard II |
Director |
2021-10-01 |
20,627 |
2017-08-21 |
0 |
Walters Diana J |
Director |
2024-05-16 |
3,551 |
2022-03-04 |
0 |
Vaughan Charles K |
Honorary Director |
2013-03-05 |
69,786 |
2012-12-27 |
0 |
Thomas Richard M |
VICE PRESIDENT & CONTROLLER |
2024-05-03 |
3,175 |
2024-05-03 |
397 |
Sweetin Marvin L |
SR VP, Safety & Enterprise Ser |
2016-11-08 |
51,828 |
2016-11-08 |
5,060 |
Springer Stephen R |
Director |
2021-12-02 |
53,201 |
2021-12-02 |
1,000 |
Schlessman Lee E |
Honorary Director |
2011-12-12 |
231,779 |
2011-12-12 |
583,085 |
Sampson Richard A |
Director |
2024-03-08 |
10,230 |
|
0 |
Robbins J Matt |
SR VP, HUMAN RESOURCES |
2024-05-03 |
21,030 |
2024-05-03 |
2,702 |
Reddy J Patrick |
Sr VP and CFO |
2008-12-31 |
79,685 |
2008-12-31 |
8,570 |
Quinn Nancy K |
Director |
2018-08-15 |
0 |
2004-11-17 |
0 |
Quinn Carl S |
Director |
2004-07-01 |
57,769 |
2003-07-01 |
0 |
Park David J |
SR VP, UTILITY OPERATIONS |
2021-05-01 |
16,886 |
2021-05-01 |
2,659 |
Nichol Phillip E |
Director |
2011-02-09 |
16,909 |
2010-11-24 |
0 |
Meredith Thomas C |
Director |
2017-02-08 |
20,762 |
2003-07-01 |
0 |
Meisenheimer F E |
Sr VP and CFO |
2012-08-13 |
31,132 |
2012-08-13 |
4,451 |
Mcgregor Wynn D |
Senior VP, Human Resources |
2009-02-06 |
46,289 |
2009-02-06 |
8,318 |
Mcdill John S |
SR VP, UTILITY OPERATIONS |
2024-05-03 |
26,946 |
2024-05-03 |
2,063 |
Koonce Gene C |
Director |
2007-02-09 |
32,915 |
2007-02-09 |
15,195 |
Johnson Mark H |
Sr VP, Nonregulated Operations |
2009-10-31 |
40,097 |
2009-10-31 |
1,516 |
Hartsfield Karen E |
SR VP, GC & CORPORATE SECY |
2024-05-03 |
23,640 |
2024-05-03 |
1,592 |
Haefner Michael E |
PAST PRESIDENT & CEO, Director |
2019-11-05 |
122,126 |
2019-11-05 |
6,025 |
Gregory Louis P |
Sr VP, GC & Corp. Secretary |
2016-12-16 |
75,934 |
2016-12-16 |
13,567 |
Grable Robert C |
Director |
2022-01-03 |
10,092 |
|
0 |
Gordon Richard K |
|
|
0 |
|
0 |
Geiser Edward |
Director |
2024-09-10 |
100 |
|
0 |
Garza Rafael G |
|
|
0 |
|
0 |
Garland Thomas J |
Director |
2010-02-03 |
45,081 |
2003-07-01 |
0 |
Forsythe Christopher T |
SR VICE PRESIDENT & CFO |
2024-05-03 |
49,110 |
2024-05-03 |
1,372 |
Fischer R Earl |
Sr VP, Utility Operations |
2006-11-07 |
55,540 |
2006-11-07 |
12,634 |
Faulk Michelle |
Officer |
2024-09-18 |
576 |
2024-09-18 |
1 |
Esquivel Ruben E |
Director |
2019-02-06 |
7,901 |
|
0 |
Eckert Bret J |
SR VICE PRESIDENT & CFO |
2016-11-08 |
28,101 |
2016-11-08 |
678 |
Douglas Richard W |
Retired Board Member |
2018-08-16 |
6,292 |
2009-01-01 |
0 |
Donohue Sean |
Director |
2021-09-09 |
17 |
|
0 |
Compton Kelly H |
Director |
2024-03-08 |
5,917 |
|
0 |
Cocklin Kim R |
Director |
2024-03-27 |
186,339 |
2021-12-07 |
223,292 |
Cardin Richard W |
Director |
2011-02-09 |
38,553 |
2011-02-09 |
0 |
Busbee Dan |
Director |
2009-02-04 |
41,365 |
2009-02-04 |
2,000 |
Best Robert W |
Director |
2020-12-08 |
592,425 |
2016-11-04 |
67,356 |
Bain Travis W Ii |
Director |
2010-02-03 |
15,149 |
2004-09-24 |
0 |
Akers John K |
PRESIDENT & CEO, Director |
2024-05-03 |
86,384 |
2024-05-03 |
12,577 |
|