|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
9 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
33,045,890 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
0 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
23.16% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Doctor Jonathan |
President and CEO, Director |
2005-11-11 |
8,481,838 |
|
0 |
Smith Charles Haddad |
Director |
2005-11-11 |
533,111 |
|
0 |
Dedovich Monica |
Director |
2005-11-11 |
9,718,412 |
|
0 |
Manahan Michael |
Chief Financial Officer, Director |
2005-11-11 |
5,387,729 |
|
0 |
Hartz Zima |
Executive Vice President, Director |
2005-11-11 |
8,475,182 |
|
0 |
Biele Anthony R |
Officer |
2005-12-12 |
226,721 |
|
0 |
Barron Partners Lp |
10% Owner |
2006-12-19 |
0 |
|
0 |
Anthony Adam |
Resigned as Director 7/17/03 |
2003-07-11 |
43,569 |
2003-06-15 |
0 |
Simone Joseph Vincent |
Director |
2005-11-11 |
179,328 |
2004-05-20 |
0 |
|